+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Author added Maye Quade.
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Authors added Franson and Davids.
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Authors added Carlson, L.; Youakim; Thissen; Clark; Pierson; and Bly.
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce and Regulatory Reform
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor