+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- See First Special Session SF7, Art. 4, Sec. 1-20
- Division action, return to Environment and Natural Resources Finance Division
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Referred by Chair to Water Division
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Referred by Chair to Environment and Natural Resources Finance Division
- Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Authors added Poston and Brand
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy