+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- See HF2749, Art. 6-7, 12
- Second reading
- Withdrawn
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn and re-referred to Taxes
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rule 47, referred to Jobs, Agriculture and Rural Development
- Laid on table
- Second reading
- Taken from table
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received from House
- Introduction and first reading
- Laid on table
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Bill was passed as amended
- Third reading as amended
- Point of order raised, ruled well taken
- Amended
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Wednesday, April 22, 2015
- Second reading
- Committee report, to adopt as amended
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Taxes
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor