+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF1003
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to adopt as amended
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Division action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Author added Koznick
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred by Chair to Transportation Finance and Policy Division
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor