+ − Full Texts (14)
+ − Actions (50)
On May 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Effective date Various Dates
On May 2, 2014 in the House:
- Chapter number 160
- Author added Clark
On May 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rule 47, referred to Finance
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Effective date Sec. 1-3: effective 2014-2015 school year and after Sec. 4 and 5: effective 4/10/2014 Sec. 6: effective 8/1/2014 Sec. 7 and 8: effective 7/1/2014
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Secretary of State Chapter 160 04/09/14
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- Secretary of State, Filed 04/09/14
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Governor's action Approval 04/09/14
- Presentment date 04/09/14
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- Governor approval 04/09/14
- Presented to Governor 04/09/14
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Motion did not prevail (vote: 57-66)
- Returned from Senate with amendment
- Motion to concur with Senate amendments
- Motion to lay on the table
- Third reading as amended by the Senate
- Point of order raised, ruled not well taken
- Motion to concur with Senate amendments question recurred
- Motion prevailed (vote: 69-63)
- Bill was repassed as amended by the Senate (vote: 69-63)
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Special Order: Amended
- Third reading Passed (vote: 36-31)
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Comm report: To pass as amended
- Second reading
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rule 12.10: report of votes in committee (Nelson amendment)
- Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn and re-referred to Education
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Author added Laine
On May 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Special Order: Amended
- Laid on table
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Comm report: To pass as amended
- Second reading
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from House
- Referred to Finance
- Introduction and first reading
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Amended
- Third reading as amended
- Bill was passed as amended (vote: 72-57)
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, May 6, 2013
On April 20, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to pass as amended
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Author added Liebling
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Author added Isaacson
- Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Author added Johnson, S.
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Education Finance
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Author added Bernardy
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Government Operations
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Civil Law
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Policy
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor