+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On January 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Effective date 01/01/14
On January 1, 2014 in the House:
- Effective date 01/01/14
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Chapter number 92
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Secretary of State Chapter 92 05/24/13
- Governor's action Approval 05/24/13
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Secretary of State, Filed 5/24/2013
- Governor approval 5/24/2013
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Presentment date 05/21/13
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Presented to Governor 05/21/13
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Returned from Senate
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading Passed (vote: 51-1)
- Special Order: Rule 45 amendment stricken
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF1033
- Second reading
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from House
- Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF1033, now on General Orders
- Introduction and first reading
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading
- Bill was passed (vote: 125-1)
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Friday, April 26th, 2013
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to pass as amended
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Amended
- Third reading
- Motion to re-refer Agriculture Policy (vote: 60-70)
- Motion did not prevail (vote: 60-70)
- Motion to refer Judiciary Finance and Policy
- Motion did not prevail (vote: 59-70)
- Motion to re-refer Transportation Policy (vote: 60-69)
- Motion did not prevail (vote: 60-69)
- Motion to re-refer Rules and Legislative Administration
- Motion prevailed
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Wednesday, April 17, 2013
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to pass
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety Finance and Policy