+ − Full Texts (10)
+ − Actions (35)
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- See also SF 1664, Sec. 21
- Effective date Various Dates
- Secretary of State Chapter 84 05/24/13
- Governor's action Approval 05/24/13
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Chapter number 84
- Secretary of State, Filed 5/24/2013
- Governor approval 5/24/2013
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Presentment date 05/21/13
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Presented to Governor 05/21/13
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Bill was repassed as amended by the Senate (vote: 73-59)
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- House concurred and repassed bill
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading as amended by the Senate
- Motion prevailed (vote: 72-60)
- Motion to concur with Senate amendments
- Returned from Senate with amendment
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Special Order: Amended
- Third reading Passed (vote: 40-23)
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Comm report: To pass as amended
- Second reading
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from House
- Referred to Finance
- Introduction and first reading
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Bill was passed as amended (vote: 74-60)
- Third reading as amended
- Amended
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- Author added Bernardy
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, April 22, 2013
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to pass as amended
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Author added Moran
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Author added Abeler
- Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance (vote: 71-61)
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Policy
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy