+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- See SF5
- Author added Murphy, M.
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Higher Education Policy and Finance
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Author added Hortman.
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Civil Law and Data Practices
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- Author added Rosenthal.
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Author added Loeffler.
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Public Safety and Crime Prevention Policy and Finance
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Author added Ward.
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Author added Kahn.
On February 16, 2015 in the House:
- Authors added Newton and Wills.
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Higher Education Policy and Finance
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor