+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Effective date 05/25/13
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Secretary of State Chapter 101 05/24/13
- Governor's action Approval 05/24/13
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Chapter number 101
- Secretary of State, Filed 5/24/2013
- Governor approval 5/24/2013
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Presented to Governor 05/21/13
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Presentment date 05/21/13
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Returned from Senate
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading Passed (vote: 49-12)
- Special Order
On April 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Comm report: Subst. for SF on General Orders SF551
- Second reading
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from House
- Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF551, now on General Orders
- Introduction and first reading
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Bill was passed (vote: 118-13)
- Third reading
- Amendments offered
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Wednesday, April 24, 2013
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to pass
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations