+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 3, 2022 in the House:
- See 2021 First Special Session SF9
- Second reading
- Committee report, to adopt
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- House rule 4.20, interim disposition of bills, returned to State Government Finance and Elections
- Second reading
- Committee report, to adopt as amended
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Division action, return to State Government Finance and Elections
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Feist
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Huot
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- Referred by Chair to Local Government Division
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to State Government Finance and Elections