+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Environment and Natural Resources Finance and Policy
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Miller
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Lippert
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Vang
On February 15, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Acomb
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Wazlawik
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Agriculture Finance and Policy