+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Author added Moran.
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Author added Dettmer.
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Author added Fischer.
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Author added Loon.
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- Authors added Poston and Bernardy.
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Author added Lee.
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Author added Johnson, S.
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Authors added Howe, Pinto, and Dehn, R.
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Author added Thissen.
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Security Policy and Finance
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor