+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- See Senate file in House SF341
- HF indefinitely postponed
- Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF341
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to adopt
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Author added Ecklund.
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Author added Nornes.
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Reform