+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to pass as amended
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Authors added Dehn, R., and Schoen
- Committee report, to pass and re-refer to Civil Law
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Author added Laine
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor