+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Hassan
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Lippert
On January 25, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Bernardy
On January 21, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Jordan
On January 14, 2021 in the House:
- Authors added Freiberg and Stephenson
On January 11, 2021 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to State Government Finance and Elections