+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 16, 2020 in the House:
- Bill was passed
- Third reading
- Amendments offered
- Motion prevailed
- Motion for reconsideration third reading
- Third reading
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Saturday, May 16, 2020
On May 13, 2020 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to adopt as amended
On May 4, 2020 in the House:
- Joint rule 2.03 waived
- Committee report, re-refer to Ways and Means
- Joint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
On April 17, 2020 in the House:
- Author added Becker-Finn
On April 14, 2020 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance Division
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor