+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Taken from table
On May 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Laid on table
- Second reading
- Taken from table
On May 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Laid on table
- Introduction and first reading
- Received from House
On May 15, 2020 in the House:
- Bill was passed
- Third reading
On May 13, 2020 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Friday, May 15, 2020
On May 12, 2020 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to adopt as amended
On May 9, 2020 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
On May 7, 2020 in the House:
- Joint rule 2.03 waived
- Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to State Government Finance Division
On May 4, 2020 in the House:
- Joint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration
- Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to State Government Finance Division
On March 16, 2020 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor