+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- HF indefinitely postponed
- Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register
On April 20, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF324
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to pass
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Author added Murphy, E.
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor