+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Author added Bierman
On March 15, 2019 in the House:
- Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Author added Robbins
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- Author added Tabke
- Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Health and Human Services Policy
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Author added Edelson
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- Authors added Stephenson and Elkins
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Author added Huot
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Authors added Mahoney, Demuth
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor