+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 14, 2020 in the House:
- Motion prevailed
- Motion to lay on the table
- Reported to the House
On May 12, 2020 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, May 14, 2020
On May 11, 2020 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to adopt as amended
On May 9, 2020 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means
On April 30, 2020 in the House:
- Joint rule 2.03 waived
- Committee report, re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance Division
On April 28, 2020 in the House:
- Joint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance Division
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Early Childhood Finance and Policy Division
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor