+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Greenman
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Authors added Hassan and Frazier
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Hollins
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Authors added Gomez and Hornstein
- Division action, return to Human Services Finance and Policy
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Referred by Chair to Preventing Homelessness Division
On January 25, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Bernardy
On January 21, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Moller
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- Authors added Reyer and Olson, L.
On January 11, 2021 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Human Services Finance and Policy
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor