+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- HF indefinitely postponed
- Bills not identical, R/S, SF substituted on General Register
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF346
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Wednesday, April 17, 2013
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to pass
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Author added Simon
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety Finance and Policy
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor