+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- HF indefinitely postponed
- Bills not identical, R/S, SF substituted on General Register
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF345
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to pass
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Policy
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Civil Law
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor