+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On April 25, 2018 in the House:
- Author added Baker.
On April 9, 2018 in the House:
- Author stricken Koznick.
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- Author added Koznick.
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Author stricken Swedzinski.
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce and Regulatory Reform
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor