+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On May 16, 2018 in the House:
- See Senate file in House SF3297
- HF indefinitely postponed
- Bills not identical, SF substituted on Calendar for the Day
On May 15, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF3297
On May 14, 2018 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Wednesday, May 16, 2018
On March 26, 2018 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to adopt
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations and Elections Policy