+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On May 11, 2015 in the House:
On May 8, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF229
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Author added Poppe.
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Author added Bernardy.
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to adopt
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to State Government Finance
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Author added Newton.
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce and Regulatory Reform
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor