+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On May 17, 2018 in the Senate:
On May 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF3554, now on General Orders
- Introduction and first reading
- Received from House
On May 16, 2018 in the House:
- Bill was passed
- Third reading
On May 14, 2018 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Wednesday, May 16, 2018
On April 9, 2018 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to adopt
On March 29, 2018 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to State Government Finance
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations and Elections Policy
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor