+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- Author added Moran.
On April 12, 2018 in the House:
- Author added Slocum.
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Authors added Christensen and Theis.
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- Author added West.
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Innovation Policy