+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Authors added Backer and Petersburg
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- Authors added Runbeck and Anderson
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Author added Poston
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Author added Mekeland
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Authors added Nornes, Daniels, Hertaus, and Gruenhagen.
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Authors added Green, Heinrich, Lucero
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Labor
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor