+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On August 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Effective date 08/01/16
On May 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Secretary of State Chapter 116 05/19/16
On May 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor's action Approval 05/19/16
On May 19, 2016 in the House:
- Chapter number 116
- Secretary of State, Filed 05/19/16
- Governor approval 05/19/16
On May 17, 2016 in the House:
- Presented to Governor 05/17/16
On May 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Presentment date 05/17/16
On May 13, 2016 in the House:
- Returned from Senate
On May 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Special Order
- Third reading Passed
On May 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second reading
- Comm report: Subst. for SF on General Orders SF2829
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received from House
- Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF2829, now on General Orders
- Introduction and first reading
On May 4, 2016 in the House:
- Bill was passed
- Third reading
On May 2, 2016 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Wednesday, May 4, 2016
On April 11, 2016 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to adopt
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Author added Pugh.
On March 31, 2016 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Government Operations and Elections Policy
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Crime Prevention Policy and Finance
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor