+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 15, 2020 in the House:
- See Senate file in House SF3683
- HF indefinitely postponed
- Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register
On May 14, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF3683
On May 13, 2020 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Friday, May 15, 2020
On May 12, 2020 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to adopt as amended
On May 7, 2020 in the House:
- Joint rule 2.03 waived
- Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means
- Joint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
On February 17, 2020 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Higher Education Finance and Policy Division
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor