+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Youakim
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Raleigh
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Lippert
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Theis
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Authors added Feist, Hornstein, Long, and Gomez
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Torkelson
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Pinto
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Authors added Baker, Bernardy, Koznick, Masin, Greenman, Hollins
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Authors added Lucero and Hamilton
On January 28, 2021 in the House:
- Authors added Frazier and Koegel
On January 25, 2021 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Transportation Finance and Policy
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor