+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On May 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Environment and Energy
- Introduction and first reading
- Received from House
On May 18, 2016 in the House:
- Bill was passed
- Third reading
On May 16, 2016 in the House:
- Authors stricken Ecklund and Metsa.
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Wednesday, May 18, 2016
On March 31, 2016 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to adopt
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Government Operations and Elections Policy
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Authors added Fenton, Pugh, Anzelc, Ecklund, Metsa, Considine, and Cornish.
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Mining and Outdoor Recreation Policy
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor