+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 2, 2016 in the House:
- See Senate file in House SF 2414
- HF indefinitely postponed
- Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register
On April 28, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF 2414
On April 11, 2016 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to adopt as amended
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Civil Law and Data Practices
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Reform
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor