+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Authors added Erhardt, Pierson, and Hancock.
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Author added Isaacson.
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Taxes
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Author added Wills.
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Author added Atkins.
On January 22, 2015 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Veterans Affairs Division