+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Author added Isaacson
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Author added Johnson, S.
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Author added Bernardy
On January 17, 2013 in the House:
- Author added Yarusso
On January 14, 2013 in the House:
- Author added Kahn
On January 10, 2013 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Finance