+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- Returned by Chair to Government Operations
- Author added Long
On February 17, 2020 in the House:
- Referred by Chair to Subcommittee on Elections
- Committee report, without further recommendation re-refer to Government Operations
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Authors added Youakim, Bahner, Bernardy, and Mann
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to State Government Finance Division