+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On April 20, 2016 in the House:
- Author added Loon.
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- Authors added Daniels, Metsa, Lueck, and Moran.
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Taxes
On March 30, 2016 in the House:
- Authors added Anderson, C., and Vogel.
On March 29, 2016 in the House:
- Author added Theis.
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- Authors added Laine and Atkins.
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Authors added Whelan and Nornes.
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Authors added Newton, McDonald, and Bernardy.
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Reform
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor