+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 15, 2019 in the House:
- Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Policy
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Author added Bernardy
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Author added Moller
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Authors added Dehn, Masin, and Loeffler
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor