+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (36)
On May 20, 2019 in the House:
- Chapter number 34
On May 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Secretary of State Chapter 34 05/17/2019
On May 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Effective date 05/18/19
On May 18, 2019 in the House:
- Effective date 05/18/19
On May 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Governor's action Approval 05/17/2019
On May 17, 2019 in the House:
- Secretary of State, Filed 05/17/19
- Governor approval 05/17/19
- Presented to Governor 05/17/19
On May 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Presentment date 05/17/2019
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Motion to concur with Senate amendments
- Returned from Senate with amendment
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- House concurred and repassed bill
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Motion prevailed
- Third reading as amended by the Senate
- Bill was repassed as amended by the Senate
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading Passed
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- House rule 1.15 (c), message requesting concurrence received
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Special Order: Amended
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading
- Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF2841
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF2841, now on General Orders
- Introduction and first reading
- Received from House
On May 10, 2019 in the House:
- Authors added Masin and Halverson
On May 9, 2019 in the House:
- Third reading
- Bill was passed
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, May 09, 2019
- Committee report, to adopt
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Rules and Legislative Administration
- Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Government Operations
- Joint rule 2.03 waived
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- Division action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means
- Authors added Nornes, Pryor, Edelson, Lillie, Lien, Daniels, Layman, Klevorn, Moran, Gomez, Vang, and Runbeck
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means
- Referred by Chair to Higher Education Finance and Policy Division
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor