+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Authors added Simonson and Gunther.
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Author added Dettmer.
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Authors added Liebling and Johnson, S.
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Authors added Hertaus, Fischer, and Rosenthal.
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Author added Lien.
On January 22, 2015 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Crime Prevention Policy and Finance
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor