+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Commerce and Regulatory Reform
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Civil Law and Data Practices Policy
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Author added Gruenhagen.
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Author added Albright.
- Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Government Operations and Elections Policy
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Reform