+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (5)
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Author added Hortman
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Education Finance
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Government Operations
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Author added Slocum
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Policy