+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On May 8, 2014 in the House:
- Author added Isaacson
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- Author added Clark
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- Authors added Laine and Bernardy
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Authors added Atkins, Sawatzky, and Morgan
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- Authors added Paymar and Selcer
On April 4, 2014 in the House:
- Authors added McNamar, Schoen, and Hornstein
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Education Finance
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Author added Urdahl
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Author added Nornes
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Author added Ward, J.E.
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Policy
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor