+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On August 1, 2014 in the House:
- Effective date
On May 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Secretary of State Chapter 204 05/06/14
On May 6, 2014 in the House:
- Governor's action Approval
On May 5, 2014 in the House:
- Presentment date
- Returned from Senate
On May 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Special Order
- Third reading Passed (vote: 57-0)
On April 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Comm report: Subst. for SF on General Orders SF2195
- Second reading
On April 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received from House
- Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF2195, now on General Orders
- Introduction and first reading
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- Amendments offered
- Bill was passed (vote: 130-0)
- Point of order raised
- Third reading
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Wednesday, April 23, 2014
On April 4, 2014 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Tuesday, April 8, 2014
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to adopt
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Author added Pugh
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Author added O'Neill
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Civil Law
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Judiciary Finance and Policy