+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (5)
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Transportation Finance
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Transportation Policy
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- Author added Marquart
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Authors added Sawatzky, Halverson; Ward, J.E.; Dill, and Gunther.
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy