+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- Author added Loeffler.
On April 11, 2016 in the House:
- Author added Backer.
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- Author added Bernardy.
On March 31, 2016 in the House:
- Author added Isaacson.
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Author added Youakim.
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Higher Education Policy and Finance
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor