+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On August 1, 2014 in the House:
- Effective date
On May 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Secretary of State Chapter 206 05/09/14
On May 9, 2014 in the House:
- Governor's action Approval
On May 6, 2014 in the House:
- Presentment date
On May 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third reading Passed (vote: 56-0)
- Special Order
On May 5, 2014 in the House:
- Returned from Senate
On May 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Comm report: Subst. for SF on General Orders SF2166
- Second reading
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading
- Received from House
- Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF2166, now on General Orders
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- Bill was passed (vote: 111-14)
- Third reading
On April 28, 2014 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Wednesday, April 30, 2014
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to adopt
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations