+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Government Operations
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Authors added Dettmer and Schoen
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Authors added Yarusso and Lillie
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Author added McNamara
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Author added Fischer
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor