+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 11, 2016 in the House:
- See Senate file in House SF 1898
- HF indefinitely postponed
- Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register
On May 9, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF 1898
On April 1, 2016 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to adopt as amended
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Authors added Barrett; Dehn, R.; and Newton.
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce and Regulatory Reform